BLUE VAN ARMED FORCES & VETERANS DROP-IN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to support veterans their families and cares. We achieve this through signposting and referring to professional services, befriending and social inclusion. Supporting those who have been left with social and health inequalities. We provide help at the point of need, when needed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- Kent
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 01 February 2021: CIO registration
- BLUE VAN DROP-IN (Working name)
- BLUE VAN VETERANS DROP-IN CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Horseman | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Joan Scudder BAHonsQTS | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.81k | £12.60k | £8.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.07k | £16.88k | £12.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Feb 2021 as amended on 13 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EX-ARMED FORCES VETERANS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, ILL HEALTH OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, BY THE PROVISION OF SPECIALIST INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 DOMINICA COURT
SOUTH HARBOUR
EASTBOURNE
EAST SUSSEX
UK
BN23 5TR
- Phone:
- 07570193118
- Email:
- Bluevandropin@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window