QURAN HUB ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS, LECTURES [PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS] PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON AND TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION. THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shahid Bashir | Chair | 16 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Amjad Ayoub | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tanwir Sadiq | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Asif | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Haseeb Mohyuddin | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £710 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS, LECTURES [PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS] PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON AND TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION. THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 PROFFITT CLOSE
WALSALL
WS2 8BD
- Phone:
- 07411340018
- Email:
- shahid19921@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window