CENTRAL GALAXY COVENTRY TRAMPOLINE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Central Galaxy Coventry Trampoline Club is a successful organisation that continues to develop and enable the sport to reach more people, both within the West Midlands region but also Nationally. The Club runs six days a week, providing the highest quality training from British Gymnastics certified coaches within a fun, encouraging and safe environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
Governance
- 24 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE HAMILL | Chair | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Poolton | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Salisbury | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Armitage | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|||||
CONNIE RAE CLIFF | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CUMING | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
STACEY CHRISTOPHERSON | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
EMMA LOUISE KAVANAGH | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.64k | £142.33k | £140.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.83k | £115.40k | £128.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.26k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN COVENTRY AND SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN TRAMPOLINE GYMNASTICS AND OTHER GYMNASTICS DISCIPLINES, BOTH RECREATIONALLY AND COMPETITIVELY. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE “FACILITIES” MEANS BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT, ACCESS TO COACHING AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 CARROLL CLOSE
CAWSTON
RUGBY
WARWICKSHIRE
CV22 7XA
- Phone:
- 07931991567
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window