HORSFORTH VILLAGE HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We conduct research into local history and publish the results in books which we sell. We have a Museum, which opens at the weekend from April until the end of November and is run entirely by volunteers. Children from local schools and other groups visit to learn about local history. Talks to which the public are invited are held monthly. Fund raising coffee mornings are held monthly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Leeds City
Governance
- 24 February 1986: Standard registration
- HORSFORTH VILLAGE MUSEUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter John Mallott QPM | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Gareth Hughes | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr ALASTAIR LAURENCE | Trustee | 19 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.44k | £25.64k | £7.51k | £13.12k | £9.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.12k | £12.15k | £5.66k | £8.67k | £12.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1305 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JUNE 1985 AS AMENDED 4 DECEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF HORSFORTH AND ITS IMMEDIATE SURROUNDINGS BY PROMOTING THE STUDY, AND INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS, OF THE LOCAL HISTORY OF THE TOWNSHIP OF HORSFORTH IN ALL ITS ASPECTS, AND BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A LOCAL MUSEUM.
Area of benefit
HORSFORTH AND ITS IMMEDIATE SURROUNDINGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 The Green
Horsforth
Leeds
LS18 5JB
- Phone:
- 01132819877
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window