BANDSTAND BEDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BBA is a volunteer-led organisation based on Clapham Common, formed to promote environmental sustainability, food growing and the support of wildlife. BBA has three growing spaces including a large community garden with a field kitchen. These provide people with an opportunity to get outdoors to learn, share and practise horticultural skills, meet people and be at one with the natural world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
138 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
Governance
- 25 January 2021: CIO registration
- BANDSTAND BEDS (Working name)
- BBA (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID RONALD DANDRIDGE | Chair | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Baljinder Kaur Dhaliwal | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Charles Batcheler | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Veronica Keane | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Haselden | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Besso | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth David | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.13k | £8.94k | £14.59k | £8.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.47k | £6.69k | £12.71k | £9.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.22k | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 25 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO: 1. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION BY PROVIDING AN AREA FOR USE AS A COMMUNITY GARDEN FOR INDIVIDUALS IN CLAPHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING TRAINING, WORKSHOPS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES IN THE SUBJECTS OF HORTICULTURE, FOOD GROWING AND OTHER RELATED TOPICS. 3. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF A COMMUNITY GARDEN IN CLAPHAM BY PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 16 CRESSET STREET
LONDON
SW4 6BP
- Phone:
- 07548255049
- Email:
- ccbandstandbeds@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window