GREAT LIGHT CHURCH LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activites
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
87 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Tanzania
Governance
- 10 February 2021: Standard registration
- 05 December 2022: Funds received from 1147413 GREAT LIGHT CHURCH
- GLC LONDON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADEBIMPE OGUNLEYE | Chair | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adetunji Aderin | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Maku | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
HAFIS JOEL RAJI | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £277.55k | £214.93k | £294.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £316.30k | £203.99k | £281.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 FEB 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT INCLUDING THROUGH PROVIDING SERVICES FOR PRAYER AND WORSHIP AND PASTORAL CARE AND OUTREACH WORK IN THE COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Great Light Church Ltd
56 Marsh Wall
London
London
- Phone:
- 02070017700
- Email:
- info@glclondon.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window