IDIA'S COMMUNITY KITCHEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a grassroots community organisation that provides hot nutritious meals and food parcels and other items to those in need in our community at our three centres in Hoxton and Haggerston, at a local hostel and also to those referred to us by Hackney Borough Council. We build relationships with our guests so that we can signpost them to other support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £64,910 from 4 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hackney
Governance
- 05 May 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julio Jose Gallego Diaz | Chair | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aina Bosede Ewalohiwa Omo-Bare | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosa Carmina Recinos Maldonado | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Omotayo Paul Agbaje | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.49k | £20.77k | £64.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.84k | £9.55k | £49.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.05k | £64.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN HACKNEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OR IN OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING HOT MEALS, EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 MANDEVILLE STREET
LONDON
E5 0DH
- Phone:
- 07437 939896
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window