SERVICES FOR EMPOWERMENT AND ADVOCACY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Independent advocacy and participation service working across Nottinghamshire, Derbyshire, South Yorkshire and Lincolnshire - enabling homeless people within housing, health and social care settings to have a voice, participate within the services they receive and empower them to reach their full potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Lincolnshire
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 09 June 2021: CIO registration
- SEA (Working name)
- SERVICES FOR EMPOWERMENT AND ADVOCACY CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Simms | Chair | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jerry Hall | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Weightman | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANN FORD | Trustee | 12 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £232.42k | £191.71k | £206.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.05k | £217.55k | £198.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE OBJECTS OF SERVICES FOR EMPOWERMENT AND ADVOCACY ARE TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO PEOPLE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED AND IN NEED OF HOUSING, CARE OR SUPPORT THROUGH: (1) THE PROVISION OF ADVOCACY SERVICES WHICH HELP DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE TO EXPRESS THEIR VIEWS, PROVIDE FEEDBACK AND MAKE COMPLAINTS, AND UPHOLD THEIR RIGHTS, (2) THE PROVISION OF SERVICES THAT HELP DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPACITY AND LIFE SKILLS AND ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY, (3) THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT TO ORGANISATIONS WHO DELIVER SERVICES TO DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE TO HELP THEM TO BETTER UNDERSTAND THEIR SERVICE USER’S NEEDS AND ASPIRATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 201
Merchants Court
21-23 Castle Gate
Nottingham
NG1 7AQ
- Phone:
- 0800 0197 828
- Email:
- info@seaparticipation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window