THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TONG

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An Anglican Church of England Parish seeking to promote the good news gospel of Jesus in the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 17 December 2020: Standard registration
- TONG PCC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael William Shaw | Chair | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Howard Christopher Joseph Jones | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Bernadette Baker | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David James Hopson | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Edward Myerscough | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maxwell Norman Owen | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ruth Beard | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Malcolm Edward Groom | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Kerrigan | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Apter | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robert Arthur Parry | Trustee | 19 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HIRD JOSELAND | Trustee | 11 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Michael William Pilsbury | Trustee | 29 March 2004 |
|
|
||||
David Thrale Milner | Trustee | 22 April 1980 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.25k | £79.31k | £58.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.24k | £87.87k | £63.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DUMMY ENTRY WHICH MUST BE REPLACED BEFORE REGISTRATION PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Bartholomew's Church
TONG
SHIFNAL
TF11 8PW
- Phone:
- 01952291532
- Email:
- admin@shifnalbenefice.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window