MAGHULL IN BLOOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) TO PROMOTE HORTICULTURE AND FLORICULTURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO LIVE IN OR VISIT MAGHULL 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT IN MAGHULL BY THE PROMOTION OF PRACTICAL MEASURES AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF PARTNERSHIPS TO REDUCE LITTER AND IMPROVE THE GENERAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE LOCAL AREA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £11,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sefton
Governance
- 14 December 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Spicer | Chair | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Rose Williams | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Sandra Reston | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROSALYNNE GILL | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Susan Barnett | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA ROBERTSON | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RICHARD BARNETT | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheila McGuinness | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY ROBERTSON | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.80k | £21.34k | £17.51k | £24.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.11k | £26.79k | £26.75k | £18.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.00k | £12.00k | £2.20k | £11.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED ON 08 DEC 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘THE OBJECTS’) ARE: 1) TO PROMOTE HORTICULTURE AND FLORICULTURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO LIVE IN OR VISIT MAGHULL BY THE PROVISION OF FLORAL DISPLAYS IN PLACES VISIBLE TO THE PUBLIC AND OTHER ACTIVITIES WHICH DIRECTLY PROMOTE HORTICULTURE AND FLORICULTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT IN MAGHULL BY THE PROMOTION OF PRACTICAL MEASURES AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF PARTNERSHIPS TO REDUCE LITTER AND IMPROVE THE GENERAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE LOCAL AREA.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Court Hey
Maghull
LIVERPOOL
L31 6DS
- Phone:
- 07745228785
- Email:
- info@maghullinbloom.com
- Website:
-
maghullinbloom.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window