LAWRENCE SHERIFF ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An almshouse charity providing accomodation for 11 men resident in Borough of Rugby
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £22,186 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 22 October 2021: CIO registration
- 24 July 2023: Funds received from 213288 LAWRENCE SHERIFF ALMSHOUSES
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Margaret Roodhouse | Chair | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Fairbanks | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Brian Campbell Johnson Willis | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Neil Denness | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Mark Evan Cardwell Roodhouse | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY EDWARD GILLIAS | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Sarah Mary Ann Beament | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.86k | £25.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.39k | £20.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
(A) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING SOCIAL HOUSING, IN THE FORM OF ALMSHOUSE ACCOMMODATION, FOR AGED MEN RESIDENT IN THE BOROUGH OF RUGBY WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE BOROUGH FOR NOT LESS THAN TEN YEARS BEFORE THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH ACCOMMODATION DUE TO FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR LIMITED FINANCIAL RESOURCES. (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE; (C) THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY IN EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES APPOINT A RESIDENT WHO LIVES OUTSIDE THE BOROUGH OF RUGBY WHO IS OTHERWISE QUALIFIED. THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MUST RECORD THE EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE MINUTES. THE NUMBER OF RESIDENTS APPOINTED UNDER THIS SUB-CLAUSE MUST NOT EXCEED ONE THIRD OF THE NUMBER OF RESIDENTS AT ANY ONE TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Bracken Drive
RUGBY
Warwickshire
CV22 6SL
- Phone:
- 01788 560882
- Email:
- jerryroodhouse@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window