Trustees THE GIRLINGTON CENTRE

Charity number: 1194595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shabila Siddique Trustee 10 December 2024
None on record
Adeeb Ahmed Awan Trustee 10 December 2024
None on record
Shazia Nisar Trustee 06 December 2023
None on record
Dr Ruby Khalid Bhatti OBE Trustee 07 December 2022
INDEPENDENT GOVERNOR SUPPORT
Received: On time
ACTIVE BRADFORD LIMITED
Recently registered
Mohammad Salim Trustee 15 December 2021
None on record
Adal Ahmed Trustee 15 December 2021
None on record
Val Rowlands Trustee 18 November 2020
None on record
Zulfiqar Hussain Trustee 18 November 2020
None on record