Accounts and annual returns CREWE AMATEUR MUSICALS SOCIETY
Charity number: 517235

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 September 2023 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 03 October 2023 | 156 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 September 2023 | 514 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window