PLATFORM EARTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Platform Earth curates cultural fundraising events in support of environmental initiatives protecting and restoring natural habitats with great potential for carbon capture and mitigating the effects of climate change.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 September 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicole Stott | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
DARIUS SANAI | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
RUTH REBECCA GANESH | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PHILIP WADHAMS | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £366.30k | £12.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £289.54k | £88.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CONTEMPORARY ART, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN WHICH NATURE/THE NATURAL WORLD IS SUBJECT OR HAS BEEN CREATED IN AN ECOLOGICAL WAY WITH A VIEW TO RAISING AWARENESS OF ENVIRONMENTAL ISSUES. 2. TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION, AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO ADDRESS THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF CLIMATE CHANGE, CARBON RELEASE AND GLOBAL TEMPERATURE RISE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND OTHER SERVICES AND THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF CARBON NEUTRAL ART PRODUCTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 7
Trafalgar Mews
London
E9 5JG
- Phone:
- 07880 632377
- Email:
- info@platformearth.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window