OLDLAND PRESCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The pre-school provides childcare & early years education to children from the age of two years to school starting age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £157,487 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 December 2020: CIO registration
- 11 October 2022: Funds received from 1024220 OLDLAND PRESCHOOL
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aliki Zeri | Chair | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Louise Case | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jade Bethany Collinson | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pia Koch | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Jayne Gilbert | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Jenkins | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Adams | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £171.83k | £165.80k | £211.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.87k | £166.80k | £185.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £109.33k | £129.48k | £157.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY. B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OLDLAND PRE-SCHOOL
THE TERRAPINS
10 SCHOOL ROAD
OLDLAND COMMON
BRISTOL
BS30 6PH
- Phone:
- 01179328411
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window