THE TOPLIFFE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Primarily the Trust provides grants to churches, charities and other organisations to advance the Christian faith and/or relieve poverty or those in need by reason of other hardships or disadvantages. The trustees will select causes which they have an involvement with or special interest in and which align with the tenets and values of the Christian faith, aiming to improve lives and give hope.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 December 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID BRYAN TOPLIFFE | Chair | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Elise Topliffe | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH DAVID TOPLIFFE | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.55k | £7.86k | £9.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.50k | £6.54k | £8.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08 SEP 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO: A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION B) THE PREVENTION OR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY C) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY MAKING GRANTS OR BY PROVIDING ITEMS, EDUCATION, INFORMATION, ADVICE OR OTHER SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED, OR TO CHURCHES, CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES,THE MAJORITY OF WHICH ARE BASED IN ENGLAND AND WALES BUT WHICH MAY BE SUPPORTING CAUSES ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD. THE TRUSTEES WILL IDENTIFY AND SELECT SPECIFIC CAUSES TO SUPPORT WHICH ARE CONSISTENT BOTH WITH THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND WITH THE TENETS AND VALUES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH INCLUDING COMPASSION, RESPECT, SOCIAL JUSTICE, EQUALITY AND STEWARDSHIP AND WILL DETERMINE THE MEANS AND EXTENT OF THE SUPPORT TO BE PROVIDED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 ADDER HILL
GREAT BOUGHTON
CHESTER
CH3 5RA
- Phone:
- 01244345942
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window