CREATE STRENGTH GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Create Strength Group provides support to chronic users of cannabis, spice and legal highs and their families. We host mutual aid support groups across West Yorkshire and online, where experience and advice are shared in a safe, non-judgemental, abstinence-based user led environment. The group's services also includes training and research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £64,999 from 1 government contract(s) and £118,545 from 5 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Gabriel Gert Frederick Stoltz | Chair | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Shaw | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Stansbie | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Anne Phillips | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.28k | £99.34k | £354.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.66k | £67.88k | £189.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £21.67k | £65.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £118.55k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE RELIEF OF THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF ADDICTION TO CANNABIS, SPICE, NOVEL PSYCHOACTIVE SUBSTANCES (NPS - PREVIOUSLY REFERRED TO AS ‘LEGAL HIGHS’) AND OTHER SUBSTANCES AND TO PROMOTE THEIR REHABILITATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:- 1)THE PROVISION OF MUTUAL AID GROUP SUPPORT AND THE DISTRIBUTION OF INFORMATION, GUIDANCE AND ASSISTANCE TO THOSE CLOSE TO OR WITH AN INTEREST IN SUCH ADDICTIONS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CONCERNED OTHERS; 2)DELIVERING A SERIES OF LOCAL MEETINGS TO PROMOTE ABSTINENCE FROM DRUG USE, SHARE BEST PRACTISE AND PROVIDE SUPPORT INFORMATION AND ADVICE; 3)WORKING WITH GROUPS OF A SIMILAR NATURE AND EXCHANGE INFORMATION, ADVICE AND KNOWLEDGE WITH THEM, INCLUDING COOPERATION WITH OTHER VOLUNTARY BODIES, CHARITIES, STATUTORY AND NON-STATUTORY ORGANISATIONS TO ACHIEVE OUR OBJECTS; 4)SUPPORTING SOCIAL INTERACTION / INCLUSION AND AWARENESS OF; THE REASONS, SYMPTOMS AND CONSEQUENCES OF CONTEMPORARY DRUG USE, PARTICULARLY REGARDING THE THREE MAIN SPECIALIST KNOWLEDGE BASES FOUND WITHIN OUR MEMBERSHIP; NAMELY CANNABIS, SPICE AND LEGAL HIGHS; 5)PROMOTING A RANGE OF TRANSFERABLE SKILLS WITHIN OUR MEMBERSHIP AND THE COMMUNITY, SUCH AS; EMPLOYABILITY SKILLS, CONFIDENCE AND SOCIAL SKILLS, IT AND MEDIA SKILLS AND RESPONSIBILITY AND ORGANISATIONAL SKILLS. TO ENCOURAGE, DEVELOP AND SUPPORT THE PURSUIT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING WITHIN OUR MEMBERSHIP. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 SALEM STREET
BRADFORD
BD1 4QH
- Phone:
- 07759053653
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window