NORTH WALES SHEEP DOG SOCIETY (NWSDS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of agriculture, for the public benefit, in particular but not exclusively by: Promoting responsible working sheepdog ownership, breeding and training. Promoting matters pertaining to dog welfare in general. Improving the working standard of working sheepdogs by organising and promoting open and members only sheepdog trials.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Isle Of Anglesey
- Powys
- Wrexham
- France
- Germany
- Italy
- Netherlands
- Spain
Governance
- 08 March 2021: CIO registration
- 22 December 2021: Funds received from 508432 NORTH WALES SHEEPDOG SOCIETY
- CYMDEITHAS CWN DEFAID GOGLEDD CYMRU (Working name)
- NORTH WALES SHEEP DOG SOCIETY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GWILYM DAVIES | Chair | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
ELGAN JARMAN | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|||||
ALAN WYN JONES | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
DOUG LAMBIE | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ELLIS | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ROBERTS | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
IWAN GRIFFITH | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
OSIAN JONES | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
EMLYN JENNINGS | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALUN JONES | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ARWEL OWEN | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALED JARMAN | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2021 | 30/10/2022 | 30/10/2023 | 30/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.96k | £8.15k | £10.94k | £10.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.46k | £6.84k | £8.71k | £7.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 08 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF AGRICULTURE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: ·PROMOTING RESPONSIBLE WORKING SHEEPDOG OWNERSHIP, BREEDING AND TRAINING. ·PROMOTING MATTERS PERTAINING TO DOG WELFARE IN GENERAL. ·IMPROVING THE WORKING STANDARD OF WORKING SHEEPDOGS BY ORGANISING AND PROMOTING OPEN AND MEMBERS ONLY SHEEPDOG TRIALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PEN UCHELDREF
LLANSADWRN
MENAI BRIDGE
PEN UCHELDREF
LLANSADWRN
LL595SR
- Phone:
- 07522731201
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window