BILSTON TRAINING FOUNDATION LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 06 March 1986: Standard registration
- 20 August 2001: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BILSTON ENTERPRISE LIMITED (Previous name)
- JOHN STREET TRAINING LTD (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 MAY 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 8 SEPTEMBER 1989, 22 OCTOBER 1991 AND 8 JULY 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE VOCATIONAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND RE-TRAINING FOR THE PUBLIC (PARTICULARLY YOUNG PEOPLE) WHO ARE RESIDENT IN, EMPLOYED IN, EDUCATED OR TRAINED IN THE FORMER BOROUGH OF BILSTON AS DEFINED PRIOR TO THE 1968 LOCAL AUTHORITY RE-ORGANISATION WHEN BILSTON BECAME PART OF THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF WOLVERHAMPTON AND TO ENABLE THEM TO IMPROVE THEIR SKILLLS AND TO PURSUE VOCATIONAL EDUCATION OR TRAINING. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 JULY 1992)
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.