INGHAM AND CAMMERINGHAM VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE, DEVELOP, MAINTAIN AND MANAGE A VILLAGE HALL WHICH IS AVAILABLE FOR HIRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF ORGANISED GROUPS AND MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, LIVING PRIMARILY IN THE PARISHES OF INGHAM & CAMMERINGHAM, WHICH IS ALSO AVAILABLE TO OTHERS WISHING TO AVAIL THEMSELVES OF ITS FACILITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 06 March 1986: Standard registration
- INGHAM VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vikki Davies | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Snape | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Forrest | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Lindsay Wimbury | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JACKLIN | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JANE DUKE | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Louise Nadin | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
EDITH MARGARET MURRAY | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ELAINE WARREN | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY THOMAS DUGGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.43k | £45.58k | £27.93k | £17.52k | £18.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.60k | £12.20k | £31.77k | £21.65k | £44.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.55k | £41.50k | £14.74k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JULY 1985 AS AMENDED 1 JULY 1991 AS AMENDED 16 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR TE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF INGHAM AND CAMMERINGHAM IN THE COUNTY OF LINCOLN WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPTION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPRIVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
INGHAM AND CAMMERINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 Lincoln Road
Ingham
LINCOLN
LN1 2XF
- Phone:
- 01522738259
- Email:
- bookingsecretary@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window