Accounts and annual returns CHILDREN'S MUSIC MATTERS

Charity number: 1193152
Charity reporting is up to date (110 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 February 2025 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 18 February 2025 110 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 December 2022 08 February 2024 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2022 08 February 2024 101 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 December 2021 01 November 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2021 06 December 2022 37 days late Download Open in new window