Accounts and annual returns UPPER ROOM CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity Number: 517249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 January 2025 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 27 January 2025 362 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 March 2022 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 March 2022 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 February 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 February 2021 10 days late Download Open in new window