THE CRAWFORD REYNOLDS ORGANISATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objective is to provide relief for those in need by reason of youth, ill health and/or disability in Hull and the East Riding of Yorkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 27 January 2021: Standard registration
- THE NEIL CRAWFORD FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Reynolds | Chair | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robert Reynolds | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.36k | £466 | £28.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 June 2023 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 MAR 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 JAN 2021
Charitable objects
PROVIDING RELIEF FOR THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, ILL HEALTH AND/OR DISABILITY WITHIN HULL AND THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
C R REYNOLDS LTD
REDCLIFF COURT
REDCLIFF ROAD
HESSLE
HU13 0EY
- Phone:
- 01482637373
- Email:
- stephen@crreynolds.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window