THE NOMAD TRUST (LINCOLN)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of emergency accommodation to single homeless with support needs and resettlement advice and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 02 May 1986: Standard registration
- 22 December 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 22 December 2009: Funds transferred to 243017-1 THE NOMAD TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £273.98k | £340.34k | £388.91k | £375.68k | £444.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £332.21k | £330.25k | £298.46k | £350.16k | £410.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 12 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 05 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 11 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 24 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 31 July 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 24 July 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 09 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 17 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 03 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 05 December 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 JANUARY 1986, ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 10 JUNE 2004 AND AMENDED 30 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. (B) THE CARE OF PERSONS IN NEED. (C) IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO HTE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE CARE OF PERSON WHO HAVE BEEN CONVICTED OF CRIMINAL OFFENCES AND WHO ARE HOMELESS OF SUFFERING FORM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL INFIRMITY OF WHO BY REASON OF ADVERSE CIRCUMSTANCES (INCLUDING THEIR PAST MANNER OF LIFE OR CRIMINAL ACTS) ALCOHOLISM DRUG DEPENDENCY OR ILL HEALTH ARE IN NEED OF HELP IN ACQUIRING A SETTLED WAY OF LIFE. (D) TO EDUCATE TRAIN AND SEEK TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PERSONS MENTIONED IN SUB-CLAUSE C. (E) TO ACCOMMODATE OR ASSIST IN ACCOMMODATING THE HOMELESS WHO ARE IN NEED. (F) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN PROVINDING FOOD CLOTHING AND GOODS TO THE NEEDY. (G) TO PROVIDE A CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING SERVICE.
Area of benefit
CITY OF LINCOLN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window