MENBERE MENGIST HOLY BEALEWOLD (HOLY GOD THE SON) ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHIDO CHURCH (MMHBEOTC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donate clothes and money to the people who suffered by natural and accidental disasters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 23 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TEKETEL DEMAMU GICHAMO | Chair | 23 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Taye Berhanu AMBAW | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Woldemichael ABEBE | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
TEKILIL GEBREKRISTOS | Trustee | 11 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
TESFAYE ABRAHAM | Trustee | 23 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
KIDUS Samual AMANUAL | Trustee | 23 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.45k | £9.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18 | £5.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THIS CIO IS ESTABLISHED TO BROADEN THE BELIEFS OF CHRISTIANITY,THE ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHIDO CHURCH (EOTC) THROUGH OUT THE PEOPLE. IT SERVES THE ETHIOPIAN COMMUNITIES OF SHEFFIELD AND ACROSS ENGLAND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEF AS PROFESSED BY THE ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHIDO CHURCH WITHIN ENGLAND. ALSO, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SPIRITUAL SERVICES, FUNDS, GOODS, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT. THE ADVANCEMENT OF ETHIOPIAN HERITAGE AND CULTURE IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT, THROUGH BUILDING A STRONG EOTC COMMUNITY AND BESTOWING ITS FAITH, TRADITION AND TEACHINGS TO OUR CHILDREN AND CATECHUMEN (NEW CONVERTS). ANYONE WHO ACCEPTS THE CANON AND DOGMA OF THE ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHIDO CHURCH (EOTC) CAN BENEFITS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEELEY VICARAGE
151 GLEADLESS ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S2 3AE
- Phone:
- +447946510368
- Email:
- kidusbealewold29@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window