HANLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 517258
Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

looks after land round village hall

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £7,063
Total expenditure: £5,294

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 April 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tracy Stuart-Allen Trustee 01 August 2019
None on record
Philip Spilsbury Trustee 15 March 2016
RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £10.97k £19.73k £7.06k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £3.25k £2.34k £5.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £10.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 January 2023 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 February 2022 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Holly Farm
Bell Lane
Broadheath
TENBURY WELLS
WR15 8QX
Phone:
07972183164
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available