THE MALTBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Village Hall is the focal point of village life providing facilities for the use of recreational, charitable and educational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 13 March 1986: Standard registration
- MALTBY VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsey Newby | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Mcdonnell | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathy Prudom | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Fellowes | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Moore | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Dawe | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANNE DUFFUS | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ESMOND CROSSMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.38k | £3.30k | £1.66k | £5.05k | £8.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.04k | £2.82k | £3.56k | £5.33k | £10.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 28 OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MALTBY (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (2) THE SAID LAND AND BUILDING SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MALTBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
PEAR TREE COTTAGE
HIGH LANE
MALTBY
MIDDLESBROUGH
TS8 0BG
- Phone:
- 01642590764
- Email:
- e_crossman@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window