BRIGANTIA CREATIVE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support positive social change through arts and culture. We collaborate nationally and internationally with artists, producers, facilitators and thinkers to bring new opportunities to the people and places that need them most. We lead ACE's 'Creative People and Places' NPO in Kirklees 'Creative Scene' and seek to develop new spaces for cultural production, presentation and creative enterprise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 September 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Douglas | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sephora Maria Collins | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Atkinson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £438.33k | £437.46k | £422.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £283.74k | £286.70k | £373.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £105.94k | £23.38k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 SEP 2020 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 JUL 2021 as amended on 16 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PRIMARILY IN KIRKLEES, THE YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE REGION: 1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE CULTURE OF KIRKLEES, THE YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE REGION AND THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A. PROMOTING PARTICIPATION IN THE ARTS BY PRESENTING ARTS WORKS, COMMISSIONS, CONCERTS, PERFORMANCES, EXHIBITIONS AND FESTIVALS; AND B. PROVIDING TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT OPPORTUNITIES IN THE ARTS. 2. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE ARTS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: DISABILITY, UNEMPLOYMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, OLDER AGE, ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL), RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Right Hand Side
5th Floor
Block A
Empire House
Wakefield Road
DEWSBURY
- Phone:
- 07714249968
- Email:
- info@wearebrigantia.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window