CHABAD OF HAMPSTEAD GARDEN SUBURB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity set up with the aim of advancement of the Orthodox Jewish faith in accordance with the principles and teachings of Chabad by providing Jewish people with educational programs and social activities that will build and develop a meaningful relationship to their Jewish heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
Governance
- 24 February 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR HARRIS SIDELSKY | Chair | 07 August 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
ELI ITZINGER | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
David Sheinman | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £625.41k | £500.88k | £338.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £204.48k | £464.51k | £393.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.78k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £617.63k | £500.88k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £7.78k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £134.39k | £300.09k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £9.47k | £2.85k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.66k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £60.62k | £161.56k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 AUG 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO:- (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND TEACHINGS OF CHABAD BY PROVIDING JEWISH PEOPLE WITH EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMS AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES THAT WILL BUILD AND DEVELOP A MEANINGFUL RELATIONSHIP TO THEIR JEWISH HERITAGE, AND (2) THE ADVANCEMNET OF EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chabad of Hampstead Garden Suburb
39-41 THE MARKET PLACE
FALLODEN WAY
LONDON
NW11 6JT
- Phone:
- 07812111890
- Email:
- info@chabadhgs.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window