EXPERIENCE GIVING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To offer training, education and up-skilling of refugees and internally displaced people and their dependents in need to help them become independent and self-dependent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ethiopia
- Sudan
- Turkey
Governance
- 27 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Zuhaib Keekeebhai | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Muhammad Akunjee | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mahmoud Asgheddi | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aminale Islam | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.88k | £46.17k | £40.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.87k | £18.35k | £1.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 June 2023 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 June 2023 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER, TROUBLE, HARDSHIP OR CATASTROPHE BY: A) ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO CHARITIES AND/OR ORGANISATIONS. B) WORKING TO IMPROVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF REFUGEES AND INTERNALLY DISPLACED PEOPLE AND THEIR DEPENDENTS; C) OFFERING TRAINING, EDUCATION AND UP-SKILLING OF REFUGEES AND INTERNALLY DISPLACED PEOPLE AND THEIR DEPENDENTS IN NEED TO HELP THEM BECOME INDEPENDENT AND SELF-DEPENDENT’
Contact information
- Address:
-
Experience Giving
Hornsey Park Surgery
114 Turnpike Lane
London
- Phone:
- 07885501244
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window