BLISWORTH BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is a Baptist Church providing spiritual support and growth for people of all ages, in both the local and wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £6,523 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 16 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Dennis Hillyard | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Marie Puffett | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raymond George Payne B.ED Hons. | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Brown B.SC Hons. | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Maycock | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Leslie Ash | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Anthony White | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.31k | £32.26k | £42.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.92k | £32.25k | £37.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 16 DEC 2020 AMENDED ON 29 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE:- 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. 3.1.2 THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLISWORTH BAPTIST CHURCH
CHAPEL LANE
BLISWORTH
NORTHAMPTON
NN7 3BU
- Phone:
- 01604857654
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window