THE HERITAGE GROUP, BELLINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO is to advance education of the public in the history, archaeology, geography, the environment and related aspects of the North Tyne and Redesdale Valleys by in particular but not exclusively: a. the management of a heritage centre in Bellingham b. the provision for education, study and other suitable facilities c. supporting and co-ordinating research and displays
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northumberland
Governance
- 14 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Paul Gibbon | Chair | 14 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Anne Galbraith CBE | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Katrine Anderson | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|||||
STANLEY FREDERICK OWEN M.A. | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Wesley Turnbull | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £100.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £63.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 December 2023 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 December 2023 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 April 2023 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 December 2023 | 406 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, ARCHAEOLOGY, GEOGRAPHY, THE ENVIRONMENT AND RELATED ASPECTS OF THE NORTH TYNE AND REDESDALE VALLEYS BY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: A.THE MANAGEMENT OF A HERITAGE CENTRE IN BELLINGHAM B.THE PROVISION FOR EDUCATION, STUDY AND OTHER SUITABLE FACILITIES C.SUPPORTING AND CO-ORDINATING RESEARCH AND DISPLAYS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bellingham Heritage Centre
Station Yard
Woodburn Road
Bellingham
Northumberland
NE48 2DF
- Phone:
- 01434220050
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window