HAND TO HOLD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of Russian-speaking families in need in the UK, by reason of ill health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage as a result of their children or young adult with special education needs and disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 May 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Cook | Chair | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Starikova | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dina Khomyak | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.26k | £1.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.59k | £8.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF HTH ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (THE ÔOBJECTSÖ): (1) THE RELIEF OF RUSSIAN-SPEAKING FAMILIES IN NEED IN THE UK, BY REASON OF ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE AS A RESULT OF THEIR CHILDREN OR YOUNG ADULTS HAVING SPECIAL EDUCATION NEEDS AND DISABILITIES (ÔSENDÖ); (2) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONGST RUSSIAN-SPEAKING FAMILIES WITH CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS WITH SEND IN THE UK WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY BY: (A) PROVIDING A LOCAL SUPPORT NETWORK TO ENCOURAGE AND ENABLE SOCIAL INTERACTION; (B) CREATING AND CO-ORDINATING OPPORTUNITIES FOR SOCIAL INTERACTION, INCLUDING EVENTS, FORUMS AND OTHER FORMS OF SOCIAL INTERACTION; (C) INCREASING AND CO-ORDINATING OPPORTUNITIES TO ENGAGE WITH SOCIAL SUPPORT PROVIDERS AND OTHER LOCAL COMMUNITIES AND CHARITIES TO ENABLE BETTER INTEGRATION TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITIES; AND (D) PROVIDING EDUCATION AND INFORMATION TO RUSSIAN SPEAKING FAMILIES WITH CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS WITH SEND AND ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES FACED BY FAMILIES WITH CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS WITH SEND. (3) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF RUSSIAN-SPEAKING FAMILIES OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SEND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT BY: (A) ORGANISING, CO-ORDINATING OR CONNECTING TO ONLINE RESOURCES ON COUNSELLING AND PSYCHOLOGICAL SERVICES; (B) RESEARCHING AND PROVIDING ACCESS TO AVAILABLE MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT MATERIALS AND RESOURCES; (4) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF RUSSIAN SPEAKING FAMILIES WITH CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS WITH SEND, BY PROVISION OF: (A) TRANSPORT SERVICE TO AND FROM RECREATIONAL AND PUBLIC SERVICES; (B) CARE SUPPORT AT HOME; (5) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF RUSSIAN-SPEAKING FAMILIES WITH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SEND BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OF MONEY OR INFORMATION RELATING TO FUNDING OPTIONS FOR THE FOLLOWING SERVICES WHICH SUCH FAMILIES, DUE TO LACK OF MEANS, WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO OBTAIN: (A) PSYCHOLOGICAL SUPPORT, INCLUDING COUNSELLING BY LICENSED COUNSELLORS; AND (B) LEGAL SUPPORT, INCLUDING ADVICE BY QUALIFIED SOLICITORS AND LEGAL SPECIALISTS WITH EXPERTISE RELATING TO SEND CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; (6) NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 MEADOW ROAD
PINNER
HA5 1ED
- Phone:
- +447596475349
- Email:
- info@handtohold.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window