APPLEDORE MARITIME HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation of local historic buildings, maritime traditions, maritime skills, maritime artefacts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 27 April 2021: CIO registration
- 20 December 2023: Funds received from 1115006 APPLEDORE MARITIME HERITAGE TRUST
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annemarie Munro | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Avery | Trustee | 17 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Puddy | Trustee | 17 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Andrew Laugharne | Trustee | 17 April 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.25k | £10.07k | £5.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.66k | £9.23k | £8.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £750 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF APPLEDORE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Mount
Northdown Road
Bideford
--None--
EX39 3LP
- Phone:
- 07720211038
- Email:
- info@amhtrust.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window