THE CHRISTINE TAYLOR MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity Number: 517282
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
  • Sefton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 April 1986: Standard registration
  • 18 March 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not submitted