THORNTON HEATH ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision or assistance in the provision of facilities of Islamic education and worship in accordance with the teachings of the Quraan and the Sunnah of the Prophet Muhammad (Peace be upon him). To relieve financial hardship, distress, and suffering among poor people and other people in need To advance education for the benefit of the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HANIF ADAM SULEMAN | Chair | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
YASIN HAROON | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
ASHRAF ADAM SULEMAN | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
SHAKIL KASSAM | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALTAF HAROON | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £114.83k | £156.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £49.61k | £174.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 September 2022 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OF ISLAMIC EDUCATION AND WORSHIP IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE BE UPON HIM) AS INTERPRETED BY INTERPRETED BY THE SUNNI HANAFI SCHOOL OF THOUGHT; 2) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLEAN WATER AND OTHER ESSENTIALS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; 3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS A SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THORNTON HEATH ISLAMIC CENTRE
150 GILLETT ROAD
THORNTON HEATH
CR7 8SN
- Phone:
- 07768018964
- Email:
- purecap@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window