FRANCISCAN CENTRE LADYWELL CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A quiet place for rest and prayer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 July 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SISTER JANE BERTELSEN | Chair | 15 November 2022 |
|
|||||
SISTER HELEN DOYLE | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Sr Helena McEvilly | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Sister Monica Weedon | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE WORLDWIDE FRANCISCAN MISSION TO INCLUDE, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE CONGREGATION’S CHARISM; (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, PROMOTING INTEREST IN AND KNOWLEDGE OF THE HISTORY, CULTURAL HERITAGE AND ETHOS OF THE CONGREGATION; AND (3) TO PRESERVE THE HERITAGE OF THE PROPERTY KNOWN AS LADYWELL CONVENT, ASHSTEAD LANE, GODALMING GU7 1ST THROUGH, OR BY OR ASSISTING IN, ITS RENOVATION, PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE CONGREGATIONAL LEADER SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LADYWELL CONVENT
ASHSTEAD LANE
GODALMING
GU7 1ST
- Phone:
- 01483419393
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window