ALCOHOL ACTION WALES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 12 March 1986: Standard registration
- 20 May 2004: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ALCOHOL CONCERN WALES (GWEITHGOR ALCOHOL CYMRU) (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JUNE 1985 AS AMENDED 18 MARCH 1994 AND 26 NOVEMBER 1997.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSON SUFFERING FROM ALCOHOL-RELATED PROBLEMS. TO HELP THE PREVENTION OF ALCOHOL RELATED PROBLEMS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAING FOR PROFESSIONALS AND VOLUNTEERS IN THE FIELD. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE INCIDENCE AND EFFECT ON SOCIETY OF THE USE AND ABUSE OF AND DEPENDENCE UPON ALCOHOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window