METAL FOR NEPAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees are focussing on providing food ration to various marginalised communities across Nepal. They also ran hot meals distribution on a daily basis to daily wage workers in Kathmandu for over the period of 4 months. Now currently, they are running a campaign called Warm Smiles whereby they are going to remote marginalised villages to distribute warm jackets to school children in the
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Nepal
Governance
- 26 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BHUWAN KC | Chair | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Tyler Young | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Liam Joseph Cormier | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Kalodimas | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROSS PATRICK WARNOCK | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
BIKRANT SHRESTHA | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
LIVA SIGNA PASTORE | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.49k | £5.35k | £7.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126 | £3.44k | £607 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 February 2025 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 May 2024 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 May 2024 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 May 2023 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 May 2023 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN POVERTY IN NEPAL BY PROVIDING HUMANITARIAN SUPPORT, CLOTHING, FOOD, WATER, ACCESS TO EDUCATION AND SUSTAINABILITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Bessborough Road
HARROW
Middlesex
HA1 3DL
- Phone:
- 07794095895
- Email:
- info@metalfornepal.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window