Financial history Y GANOLFAN - MORFA BYCHAN (MORFA BYCHAN COMMUNITY CENTRE)

Charity number: 517296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.00k £10.40k £15.00k £4.33k £6.51k
Total expenditure £5.04k £4.35k £10.00k £6.31k £9.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A