MANSFIELD CAT RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mansfield Cat Rescue rescues, rehabilitates, and rehomes stray, feral and unwanted cats in Mansfield Nottinghamshire and the surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
88 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 29 January 2021: CIO registration
- MANSFIELD CAT WATCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CECILIA BENNETT | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise Curtis | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Hallam | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.30k | £83.45k | £89.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.86k | £85.24k | £85.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHIN THE AREA OF NOTTINGHAM CITY AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE COUNTY UP TO AND INCLUDING BROXTOWE, GEDLING, ASHFIELD, MANSFIELD, NEWARK AND SHERWOOD, BASSETLAW, AND RUSHCLIFFE, TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS CATS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR CATS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE, REHOMING SUCH CATS WHERE POSSIBLE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
78 Roman Bank
Mansfield Woodhouse
MANSFIELD
Nottinghamshire
NG19 9DF
- Phone:
- 01623 575 888
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window