Accounts and annual returns WOLVERHAMPTON LGBT+

Charity number: 1193696
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 February 2025 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 February 2025 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 February 2024 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 February 2024 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window