FIBROSUPPORT-WALES

Charity Number: 1193505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity provides information and support to those suffering from Fibromyalgia in Wales. It also provides support to carers who need information and support on how to best support loved ones.We also work with medical professionals and other agencies to provide training in fibromyalgia awareness. It also raises awareness of the condition through social media and events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £810
Total expenditure: £353

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 February 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steffan James McMahon Chair 11 February 2021
None on record
Michael Allessi-Richards Trustee 03 February 2025
None on record
Rebecca Katherine McMahon Trustee 11 February 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £968 £804 £810
Total expenditure £233 £370 £353
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 February 2024 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 04 February 2024 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 April 2023 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 April 2023 81 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
29 Heol-Y-Mynydd
BARGOED
Mid Glamorgan
CF81 8QG
Phone:
03333355241