WAKEFIELD AND DISTRICT SPORTS ASSOCIATION FOR THE DISABLED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
,dry sports which include pool, board games , badminton, table tennis,boccia
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 17 March 1986: Standard registration
- WADSAD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Charlotte Rebecca Wendy Smart | Trustee | 22 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Margaret Morgan Mrs | Trustee | 22 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN CHADWICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSEMARY ROBERTSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DONALD TEAL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £975 | £3.51k | £541 | £755 | £991 | |
|
Total expenditure | £637 | £1.13k | £1.21k | £2.51k | £2.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MAY 1983 AS AMENDED 23 MAY 2009.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE: (A) TO ENCOURAGE, PROMOTE AND DEVELOP SPORT AND RECREATION AMONGST THE DISABLED PEOPLE AND SO TO ENABLE THEM TO COMPETE AND PARTICIPATE WITH EACH OTHER AND WITH ABLE BODIED PEOPLE. (B) TO ENDEAVOUR TO SECURE THE PROVISION AND IMPROVEMENT FACILITIES FOR SPORT AND RECREATION FOR DISABLED PEOPLE BY LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND OTHER CONTROLLING BODIES. (C) TO MAKE KNOWN TO DISABLED PEOPLE THE BENEFITS OF RECREATION THROUGH SPORTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 ELMWOOD AVENUE
WALTON
WAKEFIELD
WF2 6LS
- Phone:
- 01924251591
- Email:
- wadsadwakefield@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window