EXETER SCIENCE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Exeter Science Centre is working to create a STEAMM (Science, Technology, Engineering, Arts, Mathematics and Medicine) Discovery Centre for people of all ages and backgrounds. In parallel, we develop and deliver educational activities, events and information media for schools and the general public, particularly related to global issues and STEAMM research and industry in the region.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 26 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
59 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Plymouth City
- Somerset
- Torbay
Governance
- 27 April 2021: CIO registration
- EXETER SCIENCE CENTRE CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROF JUSTIN SIMON DILLON | Chair | 27 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Christopher John Sims | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olga Petrakova Brown | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Celia Amy Macklin Oxlade | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Louis Solomides | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/04/2022 | 26/04/2023 | 26/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.47k | £59.88k | £112.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.86k | £44.00k | £62.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 April 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 April 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 April 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 April 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 April 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 April 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY IN THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND IN SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING, ART, MATHEMATICS AND MEDICINE (STEAMM), IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: I) PROVIDING INTERACTIVE ACTIVITIES, EVENTS AND INFORMATION MEDIA; II) ESTABLISHING, DEVELOPING AND MAINTAINING A PHYSICAL STEAMM DISCOVERY CENTRE (SCIENCE CENTRE) FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT; III) DEVELOPING THE PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF AND ENGAGEMENT WITH STEAMM; IV) DEVELOPING PUBLIC ACCESS TO CURRENT SCIENTIFIC AND TECHNOLOGICAL ADVANCEMENTS PARTICULARLY IN THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND. 2. THE CHARITY SHALL ALSO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES, WHICH ARE BENEFICIAL TO THE PUBLIC AND WHICH ARE CONSISTENT WITH THE OBJECTS STATED ABOVE, AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Marsh Green Road North
Marsh Barton Trading Estate
EXETER
EX2 8NY
- Phone:
- 07821063890
- Email:
- info@exetersciencecentre.org
- Website:
-
exetersciencecentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window