Trustees INTERNATIONAL GROUP FOR THE PSYCHOLOGY OF MATHEMATICS EDUCATION
Charity Number: 1192932

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Wim Van Dooren | Chair | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Heidi Krzywacki | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ofer Marmur | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Farzaneh Saadati | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Heather Lynn Johnson | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ting-Ying Wang | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sean Chorney | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Ingram | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Juan Manuel Gonzalez-Forte | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anselm Robert Strohmaier | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicolette Anne Roberts | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicola Hodkowski | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Wee Tiong SEAH | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ban Heng Choy | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christina Marie Krause | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chiara Andra | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michal Ayalon Rahimi | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kotaro Komatsu | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Helena Johansson | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Christopher Sommerhoff | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.