THE WALESBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 517309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Maintenance and upkeep of Village Hall for the use and benefit of all residents of the parish of Walesby, Lincolnshire. The Hall is also available for hire by people living in neighbouring parishes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £5,228
Total expenditure: £4,475

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 March 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Judith Sweny Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
PETER BRAITHWAITE Trustee 12 May 2018
THE FRIENDS OF THE OLD CHURCH WALESBY ALL SAINTS
Received: On time
David John Thurman Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £6.08k £13.07k £3.20k £4.81k £5.23k
Total expenditure £4.79k £3.72k £3.17k £5.45k £4.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 13 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 08 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 26 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 05 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 06 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BLAVEN
WALESBY HILL
WALESBY
MARKET RASEN
LN8 3GW
Phone:
01673 838352
Website:

No information available