Accounts and annual returns THE SPINE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1194851

Charity reporting is up to date (194 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2025 | 194 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2025 | 194 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 April 2025 | 518 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 April 2025 | 518 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 April 2025 | 883 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 May 2025 | 925 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window