Financial history BASCHURCH VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 517312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.97k £21.95k £16.51k £16.49k £17.51k
Total expenditure £10.64k £5.96k £17.92k £21.56k £25.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £2.60k £1.40k £1.30k
Income from government grants N/A £18.60k £8.00k N/A N/A