WALLINGTON SDA HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of children and young people by providing free supplementary educational lessons in Science, Technology, English and Maths. Providing emergency food, essential toiletries and household items to individuals and families in need and/or for distribution by charities or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £7,800 from 4 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
- Surrey
- Sutton
Governance
- 03 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Javan Dyer | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tom Morton | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Connie Gbetuwa | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Morgan | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.83k | £5.22k | £13.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.83k | £3.37k | £6.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £7.80k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SUTTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION IN SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGLISH AND MATHS. 2. THE RELIEF OF FINACIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SUTTON IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND / OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Handley Page Road
Roundshaw
SM6 9GT
- Phone:
- 07912536349
- Email:
- wallingtonsdahub@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window